This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/30/2020 at 09:32:08 (UTC).

SAN LIN VS LUCHENG TECHNOLOGY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/30/2019 SAN LIN filed an Other lawsuit against LUCHENG TECHNOLOGY INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3762

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIN SAN

Defendant

LUCHENG TECHNOLOGY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Assignee

LABOR COMMISSIONER'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

12/2/2019: Assignment of Judgment - Assignment of Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

8/30/2019: Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment) - Request For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/30/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment; Filed by: San Lin (Plaintiff); As to: San Lin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned in ROOM 118 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: San Lin (Plaintiff); As to: Lucheng Technology Inc, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Judgment (Enforcement of Judgment); Filed by: San Lin (Plaintiff); As to: Lucheng Technology Inc, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff San Lin against Defendant Lucheng Technology Inc, a California Corporation on the Petition filed by San Lin on 08/30/2019 for the principal amount of $20,525.69, interest of $96.31, and costs of $395.00 for a total of $21,017.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP03762    Hearing Date: November 05, 2019    Dept: 44

The court intends to deny the petition on the ground that petitioner has an outstanding traffic warrant from this court and on the ground that petitioner is currently on active probation and has not submitted proof of approval by the probation/parole officer. Petitioner may, but need not, appear and be heard. If petitioner does not appear, the petition will be dismissed without prejudice and petitioner may reapply.