This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2019 at 14:16:21 (UTC).

SAMARIA TORRES VS JESUS HILARIO REVELES

Case Summary

On 04/11/2012 SAMARIA TORRES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESUS HILARIO REVELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0451

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAMARIA TORRES

ORLANDO TORRES

TORRES SAMARIA

TORRES ORLANDO

Defendants

JESUS HILARIO REVELES

MARIA REVELES

REVELES JESUS HILARIO

REVELES MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHAKARIAN, MOVSES

BAGHDAIAN LAW CORPORATION

Defendant Attorneys

REVELES, JESUS HILARIO

REVELES, MARIA

REVELES JESUS HILARIO

REVELES MARIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2013
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2013
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY PLAINTIFF - $1608.85. MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY PLAINTIFF - $1608.85.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • A/C - NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • 12N00451

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Plaintiffs SAMARIA TORRES,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • Exhibit(s) received in evidence for plaintiff(s): 1-Diagram of accident

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2013
  • - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - - -

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • FEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • OSC SET 06/25/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 87, RM 202 NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2012
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/09/12, IN DEPT 87

    Read MoreRead Less