Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2019 at 01:02:05 (UTC).

SALVADOR ZAMORA VS ANGELICA SUAREZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 SALVADOR ZAMORA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANGELICA SUAREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0845

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAMORA SALVADOR

Defendants

SUAREZ ANGELICA

SUAREZ VILLAREAL JESUS

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/25/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

5/13/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/23/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

5/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/23/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/23/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/23/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/19/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Salvador Zamora (Plaintiff); As to: Angelica Suarez (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/25/2019 ; Status Date changed from 05/23/2019 to 07/25/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 07/25/2019 ; Status Date changed from 07/25/2019 to 07/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Salvador Zamora on 03/19/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Jesus Suarez Villareal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/23/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 05/23/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Salvador Zamora against Defendant Angelica Suarez on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Salvador Zamora on 03/19/2019 for the principal amount of $2,000.00 and costs of $175.00 for a total of $2,175.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Salvador Zamora (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Suarez Villareal (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/01/2019; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Salvador Zamora (Plaintiff); As to: Angelica Suarez (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Salvador Zamora (Plaintiff); As to: Angelica Suarez (Defendant); Jesus Suarez Villareal (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less