This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 13:26:49 (UTC).

SALOMON DURAN VS LASHADA SHOULDERS

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 SALOMON DURAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LASHADA SHOULDERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3351

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DURAN SALOMON

ANAYA GUADALUPE

Defendant

SHOULDERS LASHADA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODRIGUEZ BARBARA MARIA

Defendant Attorney

SCHMECKPEPER KATHY ANNE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/1/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

8/1/2019: Answer - Answer

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

12/17/2018: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;) of 03/19/2019

3/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order re: related cases;) of 03/19/2019

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Isis

4/4/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Isis

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/15/2019

4/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/15/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application To set aside Dismissal

4/26/2019: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application To set aside Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

4/29/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Final Status Conference)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Nathan

5/6/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Nathan

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Yael

5/10/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Yael

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/17/2017: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

12/20/2017: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

Complaint

10/16/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/16/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Lashada Shoulders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Lashada Shoulders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Salomon Duran (Plaintiff); Guadalupe Anaya (Plaintiff); Isis Fuentes (Plaintiff); Yael Flores (Plaintiff); Nathan Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Lashada Shoulders (Defendant); Service Date: 06/06/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Yael; Signed and Filed by: Guadalupe Anaya (Plaintiff); As to: Yael Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Nathan; Signed and Filed by: Guadalupe Anaya (Plaintiff); As to: Nathan Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: dismissal for failure to serve / alternatively Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 10/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Final Status Conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2019 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 5 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing Application for Guardia ad litem: Status Date changed from 12/20/2017 to 12/13/2017; Result Date: 12/13/2017; Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketIsis Fuentes, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Guadalupe Anaya - Rejected; Submitted by: Guadalupe Anaya (Plaintiff); As to: Isis Fuentes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNathan Duran, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Guadalupe Anaya; Filed by: Guadalupe Anaya (Plaintiff); As to: Nathan Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketYael Flores, a minor by and through guardian ad litem Guadalupe Anaya; Filed by: Guadalupe Anaya (Plaintiff); As to: Yael Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Salomon Duran (Plaintiff); As to: Lashada Shoulders (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Salomon Duran (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC03351    Hearing Date: January 13, 2020    Dept: 5

 

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

salomon duran, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

LASHADA SHOULDERS,

Defendant.

Case No.: 17STLC03351

(Related to BC668199)

Hearing Date: January 13, 2020

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to reclassify as an unlimited civil case

Plaintiffs Salomon Duran, Guadalupe Anaya, Isis Fuentes, Yael Flores, and Nathan Duran (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed this limited civil action against Defendant Lashada Shoulders (“Defendant”) following a motor vehicle collision. Now, Plaintiffs move to reclassify this case as an unlimited jurisdiction case. Defendant opposes the motion.

Per Code of Civil Procedure section 86, a limited civil case is a case in which the demand, exclusive of interest, amounts to $25,000 or less. (Code Civ. Proc., § 86, subd. (a)(1).) Here, Plaintiffs captioned this case as a limited civil case, but now seek to reclassify it as an unlimited civil case. If a party files a motion for reclassification after the time to amend that party's initial pleading, the court shall grant the motion only if the moving party shows good cause for not seeking reclassification earlier. (Code Civ. Proc., § 403.040, subd. (b).)

Plaintiffs filed their initial complaint on October 16, 2017. Plaintiffs did not file this motion to reclassify until December 11, 2019, more than two years later. Plaintiffs rely on two declarations from their attorneys, Barbara Rodriguez and Tim D. Wright (collectively, “Counsel”). Counsel state: “That the extent of Plaintiff, ISIS FUENTES’s injuries, especially as to the persistent pain and severity of her disability as a result of her fractured pelvis was unforeseen at the time of the filing.” (Declaration of Tim D. Wright, ¶ 4; Declaration of Barbara Rodriguez, ¶ 5.) This constitutes good cause, so the motion is granted. Case Number 17STLC03351 shall be reclassified as an unlimited civil case.

All of the parties in the two related cases – Case Number BC668199 and Case Number 17STLC03351 – have stipulated to consolidation. The Court agrees that the cases should be consolidated and grants that stipulation. All pleadings shall be filed in Case Number BC668199. Because 17STLC03351 is the earlier case, the Court adopts the trial date from that case and sets a final status conference date:

Final Status Conference: May 28, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.

Trial: June 11, 2020, at 8:30 a.m.

The discovery and motions cut-off shall be based on this trial date. The moving parties shall provide notice.

DATED: January 13, 2020 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court