This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2020 at 16:19:04 (UTC).

SAKO AVEDISYAN VS FAYYAZ DAMMANWALLA

Case Summary

On 01/21/2020 SAKO AVEDISYAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FAYYAZ DAMMANWALLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TRICIA TAYLOR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0186

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TRICIA TAYLOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVEDISYAN SAKO

Defendants

SUN AUTO FINANCE

DAMMANWALLA FAYYAZ

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/10/2020

3/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/10/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

2/7/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

1/22/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Sako Avedisyan on 01/21/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/10/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 03/10/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Sako Avedisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 02/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket** Case Name changed from SAKO AVEDISYAN vs SUN AUTO FINANCE to SAKO AVEDISYAN vs FAYYAZ DAMMANWALLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant) to Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant) to Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 01/21/2020 to 01/22/2020; As To Parties changed from Sun Auto Finance (Defendant) to Sun Auto Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 01/21/2020 to 01/22/2020; As To Parties changed from Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant) to Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sako Avedisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Sun Auto Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Tricia Taylor in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Sako Avedisyan (Plaintiff); As to: Fayyaz Dammanwalla (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: Status Date changed from 01/22/2020 to 01/21/2020; As To Parties changed from Sun Auto Finance (Defendant) to Sun Auto Finance (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUN AUTO FINANCE CORP. is a litigant