This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2016 at 23:57:55 (UTC).

SAHYOUN, NANCY VS R22, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2014 SAHYOUN, NANCY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against R22, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ARNOLD KESSLER, ROBERT ARONOFF and WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7567

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ARNOLD KESSLER

ROBERT ARONOFF

WILLIAM V. MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAHYOUN NANCY

SCHAFF DAVID

Defendants

R22 INC. DBA STAR MANAGEMENT

STARTLINGER PETER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED ORAP/ASSETS/INSTRUCTIONS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS ISSUED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) . MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 05/02/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SW8 . RECEIPT # ING49885005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 201.75 FILED. ALLOWED ON OR AFTER 03/02/16 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. SW8 FOR CONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS ISSUED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) . MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 03/14/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SW8 . RECEIPT # ING498850005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED ORAP/ASSETS/INSTRUCTIONS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. RECEIPT # ING498850004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. SW8 FOR CONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. COUNTER . RECEIPT # ING255441010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2015
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. ROBERT ARONOFF, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BOTH PRO PER . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/19/14 . FOR (SAHYOUN, NANCY) , (SCHAFF, DAVID) . AGAINST (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) . PRINCIPAL $ 3500.00 . COSTS $ 90.00 . TOTAL $ 3590.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFENDANT, PETER STARTLINGER IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO NO PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (STARTLINGER, PETER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 12/19/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1141010E0713. HEARING SET FOR 12/19/14 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (STARTLINGER, PETER) (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (R22, INC.) DBA (STAR MANAGEMENT) , (STARTLINGER, PETER) . RECEIPT # 1141010E0713 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R22 INC. DBA STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant