This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 18:43:54 (UTC).

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA VS A M CONCRETE INCORPORATED

Case Summary

On 04/27/2017 SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against A M CONCRETE INCORPORATED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5374

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Defendants

A M CONCRETE INCORPORATED

LUNG DOUG

STEINY AND COMPANY INC

BOARD OF TRUSTEES

PFEIFFER GERALD

DE LA TORRE OSCAR

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS H

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS P

HEALTH AND

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS T

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE NORTHERN

SUPERIOR PAVEMENT MARKINGS INC

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LABORERS V

BOARD OF

KOPONEN BILL

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE NORTHERN CALIFORNIA LABOR MANAGEMENT COOPERATION TRUST

BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE NORTHERN CALIFORNIA JOINT APPRENTICESHIP AND TRAINING TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMTD LAW LLP

Defendant Attorney

SHAFFER ROBERT HOWARD JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • Hearingat 0830 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE INTERPLEADER ACTION; Filed by: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Plaintiff); As to: A M CONCRETE INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER RE INTERPLEADER ACTION: Filed By: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Plaintiff); Result: Denied; Result Date: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 06/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/25/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- DOUG LUNG (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- GERALD PFEIFFER (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- OSCAR DE LA TORRE (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- BILL KOPONEN (Defendant): Middle Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Plaintiff); As to: OSCAR DE LA TORRE (Defendant); BILL KOPONEN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA on 04/27/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to OSCAR DE LA TORRE; BILL KOPONEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Plaintiff); As to: A M CONCRETE INCORPORATED (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/07/2017; Service Cost: 111.83; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: SAFECO INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA (Plaintiff); As to: SUPERIOR PAVEMENT MARKINGS INC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/07/2017; Service Cost: 111.83; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: A M CONCRETE INCORPORATED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/29/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 04/27/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A.M. CONCRETE INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where Health is a litigant

Latest cases where SUPERIOR PAVEMENT MARKINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where STEINY & CO., INC. is a litigant