This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2016 at 11:28:39 (UTC).

SAFARIAN, RAYMOND VS ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON

Case Summary

On 07/09/2014 SAFARIAN, RAYMOND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RAY SANTANA and RICHARD F. WALMARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6026

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RAY SANTANA

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAFARIAN RAYMOND DBA SAFARI CHIROPRACTIC

Defendants

ASATRYAN SOGHOMON

MGDESYAN LAW FIRM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2014
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: APPEAL FROM SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL DE NOVO RETURNED AS TO (ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER/NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED/UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SAFARIAN, RAYMOND) DBA (SAFARI CHIROPRACTIC) . RAYMOND SAFARIAN, PRESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. NWP , HON. RICHARD F. WALMARK PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. RESPONDENT APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR APPELLANT . APPEAL IS DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF COURT'S RULING DATED 10/31/14 FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM NWP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL RECEIVED AS TO (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) . LAV532305005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON) . RECEIPT # LAV532305006 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 10/31/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP OF THE VAN NUYS SUPERIOR COURT - EAST BUILDING, 3RD FLOOR, ROOM 300 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) . RECEIPT # LAV532305005 . MATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO ON 10/31/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP OF THE VAN NUYS SUPERIOR COURT - EAST BUILDING, 3RD FLOOR, ROOM 300 . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SAFARIAN, RAYMOND) DBA (SAFARI CHIROPRACTIC) , (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. RAY SANTANA PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/03/14 . FOR (SAFARIAN, RAYMOND) DBA (SAFARI CHIROPRACTIC) . AGAINST (ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON) , (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) . PRINCIPAL $ 2039.40 . COSTS $ 105.00 . TOTAL $ 2144.40 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2014
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON) , (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON) . RECEIPT # E FILE . 70141200000071698516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) . RECEIPT # E FILE . 70141200000071698523

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1140714E1320. HEARING SET FOR 09/03/14 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. NWZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2014
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (MGDESYAN LAW FIRM) (ASATRYAN, SOGHOMON)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MGDESYAN LAW FIRM is a litigant