This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 13:00:09 (UTC).

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS TYRONE JASON CRENSHAW

Case Summary

On 01/26/2018 SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against TYRONE JASON CRENSHAW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1337

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CRENSHAW TYRONE JASON

CRENSHAW MARINA ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEDIONI DANIEL M

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/13/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

3/8/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

Notice (name extension) - of Pendency of Action

3/28/2018: Notice (name extension) - of Pendency of Action

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/27/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Entry of Judgment

6/26/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Debbie Scotti

5/30/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Debbie Scotti

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/30/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment

5/30/2018: Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/30/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Tyrone Jason Crenshaw (Defendant); Marina Ortiz Crenshaw (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Tyrone Jason Crenshaw (Defendant); Marina Ortiz Crenshaw (Defendant); Costs: 652.00; Interest: 391.56; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 02/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Marina Ortiz Crenshaw (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/11/18; Service Cost: 120.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Tyrone Jason Crenshaw (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SSADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEDIONI DANIEL M