This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 08:47:18 (UTC).

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS ELOISA R SARAO

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ELOISA R SARAO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3135

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SARAO ELOISA R

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

11/2/2016: Request for Dismissal - (Without Prejudice)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/2/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/2/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/19/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by: SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: ELOISA R SARAO (Defendant); Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/12/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION (Plaintiff); As to: ELOISA R SARAO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0003676 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SSADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION CORP. is a litigant