This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 00:52:27 (UTC).

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS EDGAR LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EDGAR LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW E. COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2447

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW E. COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendant

LOPEZ EDGAR

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/18/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/9/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

12/6/2018: Small Claims Settlement Agreement - Small Claims Settlement Agreement

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12/6/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

12/6/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 12/06/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association on 10/18/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketSmall Claims Settlement Agreement; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Lopez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/01/2018; Service Cost: 106.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from Edgar Lopez (Defendant) to Edgar Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew E. Cooper in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SSADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION CORP. is a litigant