This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2019 at 13:00:24 (UTC).

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION VS ADELA LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ADELA LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL C. KELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2114

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL C. KELLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

LOPEZ JUAN TOMAS

LOPEZ ADELA

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/12/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/22/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/22/2019

10/22/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/22/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association on 09/12/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44 updated: Result Date to 10/22/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Lopez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/24/2019; Service Cost: 133.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Tomas Lopez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/24/2019; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2019 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Saddletree Ranch Homeowners Association (Plaintiff); As to: Adela Lopez (Defendant); Juan Tomas Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael C. Kelley in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SSADDLETREE RANCH HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION CORP. is a litigant