This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 00:43:45 (UTC).

SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC. VS MARTINEZ, FERNANDO RENE

Case Summary

On 07/28/2015 SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARTINEZ, FERNANDO RENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5354

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC.

Defendant

MARTINEZ FERNANDO RENE

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/6/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)] CERTIFIED COPY OF CLAIM OF EXEMPTION MINUTE ORDER

9/6/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - [Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)] CERTIFIED COPY OF CLAIM OF EXEMPTION MINUTE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/06/2016

9/6/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 09/06/2016

Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

9/6/2016: Minute Order - (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

9/6/2016: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

Claim of Exemption

9/1/2016: Claim of Exemption

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/19/2015: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Declaration (name extension) - re: Accrued Interest ($48.80)

2/25/2016: Declaration (name extension) - re: Accrued Interest ($48.80)

Writ of Execution

3/9/2016: Writ of Execution

Minute Order

10/16/2015: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($55.00)

8/11/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($55.00)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/16/2015: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/28/2015: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims) - Electronically

7/28/2015: Fictitious Business Name (Small Claims) - Electronically

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($55.00)

8/19/2015: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - ($55.00)

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption

8/10/2016: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption

Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

8/5/2016: Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption or in lieu of Third-Party Claim

Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

8/5/2016: Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketNotice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption; Filed by: (SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: (SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC.) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Hearing for Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim: Result: Result Date: 09/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption: Result: Result Date: 09/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 09/06/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketHearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim scheduled for 09/06/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/06/2016; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Hearing on Claim of Exemption/Third-Party Claim)] CERTIFIED COPY OF CLAIM OF EXEMPTION MINUTE ORDER; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • DocketClaim of Exemption; Filed by: FERNANDO RENE MARTINEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption; Filed by: As to: (SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC.) (Plaintiff); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. {BY MAIL} . RECEIPT # ALH256899007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 48.80 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MARTINEZ, FERNANDO RENE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 09:35A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY LUIS DUARTE . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT . THE MATTER IS TRANSFERRED FORTHWITH TO DEPT 3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/16/15 . FOR (SABIE ACCEPTANCE INC.) . AGAINST (MARTINEZ, FERNANDO RENE) . PRINCIPAL $ 1275.13 . COSTS $ 95.00 . TOTAL $ 1370.13 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MARTINEZ, FERNANDO RENE) . COSTS OF $ 55.00 . **AMENDED**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MARTINEZ, FERNANDO RENE) . COSTS OF $ 55.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1150730E0836. HEARING SET FOR 10/16/15 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketFICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.