This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2020 at 06:28:46 (UTC).

SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY, LLC, VS BELLA ROSETTA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/10/2020 SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BELLA ROSETTA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0748

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

HANNA MAGDY

BELLA ROSETTA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HANNA MARYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALOMONS GARY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/10/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

4/10/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

4/10/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/10/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Marya Hanna)

4/16/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Marya Hanna)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Bella Rosetta, Inc., a California Corporation)

4/16/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Bella Rosetta, Inc., a California Corporation)

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

4/16/2020: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Magdy Hanna)

4/16/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Magdy Hanna)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

4/16/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Stay Due to Covid-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Stay Due to Covid-19 State of Emergency Declarations

4/22/2020: Notice of Stay Due to Covid-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Stay Due to Covid-19 State of Emergency Declarations

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

4/23/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

4/23/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

4/23/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

4/23/2020: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Marya Hanna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Magdy Hanna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Bella Rosetta, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL Notice of Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay Due to Covid-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: SAB Investment Property, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Bella Rosetta, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Magdy Hanna (Defendant); Marya Hanna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 04/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jessica A. Uzcategui in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SAB Investment Property, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Bella Rosetta, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Magdy Hanna (Defendant); Marya Hanna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SAB Investment Property, LLC, (Plaintiff); As to: Bella Rosetta, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Magdy Hanna (Defendant); Marya Hanna (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAB INVESTMENT PROPERTY LLC is a litigant