This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/26/2018 at 09:23:12 (UTC).

RYAN MASAO SMITH VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PROGRAMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2017 RYAN MASAO SMITH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PROGRAMS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8930

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH RYAN MASAO

Lakewood, CA 90712

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG PROGRAMS INC.

11500 Paramount Blvd,

Downey, CA 90241

 

Court Documents

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/04/2017

12/4/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/04/2017

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/4/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

E-Filing Payment Due

9/26/2017: E-Filing Payment Due

Unknown

9/26/2017: Unknown

E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/26/2017: E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/04/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 12/04/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Case assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ryan Masao Smith (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Alcohol and Drug Programs, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ALCOHOL AND DRUG is a litigant