Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/12/2017 at 19:10:52 (UTC).

RUDY ESPINOZA VS RODOLFO ESPINOZA

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 RUDY ESPINOZA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RODOLFO ESPINOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0386

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOZA RUDY

Los Angeles, CA 90023

Defendant

ESPINOZA RODOLFO

Whittier, CA 90605

 

Court Documents

(Non-Jury Trial)

12/8/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/08/2017

12/8/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/08/2017

Unknown

11/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/27/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/27/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Rodolfo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Address for Rodolfo Espinoza (Defendant) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/08/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Rodolfo Espinoza (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/09/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rudy Espinoza (Plaintiff); As to: Rodolfo Espinoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Rudy Espinoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less