This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2020 at 23:14:14 (UTC).

R&P PARTNERS LLC VS KARL FITZGERALD MYVETT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 R P PARTNERS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KARL FITZGERALD MYVETT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2129

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R&P PARTNERS LLC

Defendants

EMANUEL JOYCE HEMMANS

MYVETT KARL FITZGERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/27/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/27/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

2/27/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

2/27/2020: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/27/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

3/3/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Karl Fitzgerald Myvett)

3/3/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Karl Fitzgerald Myvett)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Joyce Hemmans Emanuel)

3/3/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Joyce Hemmans Emanuel)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/9/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/20/2020: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/20/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

3/24/2020: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

3/24/2020: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Fitzgerald Myvett (Defendant); Joyce Hemmans Emanuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 44.76

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by R&P Partners LLC on 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff R&P Partners LLC against Defendant Joyce Hemmans Emanuel and Defendant Karl Fitzgerald Myvett on the Complaint filed by R&P Partners LLC on 02/27/2020 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 4045 Ursula Avenue #21, Los Angeles, CA 90008 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Joyce Hemmans Emanuel (Defendant); Service Date: 03/01/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Fitzgerald Myvett (Defendant); Service Date: 03/01/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Joyce Hemmans Emanuel; Karl Fitzgerald Myvett; On the Complaint filed by R&P Partners LLC on 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Fitzgerald Myvett (Defendant); Joyce Hemmans Emanuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 03/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 91 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Fitzgerald Myvett (Defendant); Joyce Hemmans Emanuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Fitzgerald Myvett (Defendant); Joyce Hemmans Emanuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: R&P Partners LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Karl Fitzgerald Myvett (Defendant); Joyce Hemmans Emanuel (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where R&P PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING ALLEN