This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2019 at 12:58:23 (UTC).

ROY EDERY VS WILLIAM COMPTON

Case Summary

On 06/06/2016 ROY EDERY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAM COMPTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0147

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDERY ROI

Reseda, CA 91335

Defendant

COMPTON WILLIAM

19826 Roscoe Blvd.

Winnetka, CA 91306

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Court Order)

8/29/2016: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Request for Court Order and Answer

8/29/2016: Request for Court Order and Answer

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

6/27/2016: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

8/18/2016: Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/29/2016

8/29/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/29/2016

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

8/5/2016: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/04/2016

8/4/2016: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order of 08/04/2016

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

6/6/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

8/4/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2016
  • Updated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Status Date changed from 08/04/2016 to 08/29/2016; Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/29/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Answer on Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: WILLIAM COMPTON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/04/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Request for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: ROI EDERY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 08/04/2016; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ROI EDERY (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM COMPTON (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 06/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROY EDERY (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM COMPTON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0000279 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $3.00; Payment: 3.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0000279 (Cash); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/04/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • Updated -- ROI EDERY (Plaintiff): First Name changed from ROY to ROI

    Read MoreRead Less