This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/06/2021 at 03:53:04 (UTC).

ROWENA HOUSTON VS PATRICIA A. RHODES

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 ROWENA HOUSTON filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PATRICIA A RHODES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2645

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOUSTON ROWENA

Defendant

RHODES PATRICIA A.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/11/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2021

2/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/04/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

2/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/18/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

2/18/2021: Notice of Postponement - Notice of Postponement

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]]

2/22/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]]

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]

2/22/2021: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

3/1/2021: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

3/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/9/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/24/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 1 at 10025 East Flower Street, Bellflower, CA 90706; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Request for Court Order and Answer]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Court Order and Answer; Filed by: PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer: Name Extension changed from [Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer] to Notice of Online Dispute Resolution (ODR) Meet and Confer; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for Notice of Rejection[Request for Court Order and Answer: Name Extension changed from [Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]] to Notice of Rejection[Request for Court Order and Answer; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection Request for Court Order and Answer: Name Extension changed from [Request for Court Order and Answer] to Request for Court Order and Answer; As To Parties changed from PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant) to PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]: Name Extension: [Request for Court Order and Answer]; As To Parties changed from PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant) to PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection [Request for Court Order and Answer]]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/04/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ROWENA HOUSTON (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/07/2021; Service Cost: 300.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/04/2021 at 03:00 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/04/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROWENA HOUSTON (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA A. RHODES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less