Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 18:54:44 (UTC).

ROSIE JEIRANIAN VS MIKHAIL MEME SOBHY SHENODA

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 ROSIE JEIRANIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MIKHAIL MEME SOBHY SHENODA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4681

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEIRANIAN ROSIE

Defendant

SHENODA MIKHAIL MEME SOBHY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEPREMIAN HOSEP JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

6/3/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/3/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/3/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rosie Jeiranian (Plaintiff); As to: Mikhail Meme Sobhy Shenoda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosie Jeiranian (Plaintiff); As to: Mikhail Meme Sobhy Shenoda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rosie Jeiranian (Plaintiff); As to: Mikhail Meme Sobhy Shenoda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less