This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 00:49:40 (UTC).

ROSENFELD, JEAN VS JAHANSHAHI, SHAHROUZ

Case Summary

On 07/31/2015 ROSENFELD, JEAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JAHANSHAHI, SHAHROUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9197

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Respondents

ROSENFELD JEAN

ROSENFELD HOWARD

ROSENFELD ERIC

KAO ANNE R

KAO KENNETH K

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs, Not Classified By Court and Appellants

JAHANSHAHI SHAHROUZ

JAHANSHAHI ZAHRA

HERMAN ESTRELLA

MCKINLEY SABA

LOWE EILEEN

LOGAN KERI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROSENFELD, BENJAMIN

ROSENFELD BENJAMIN TARN

Defendant Attorney

JAHANSHAHI, ZHARA

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JAHANSHAHI, SHAHROUZ

Cross Defendant Attorneys

ROSENFELD, JEAN

ROSENFELD, ERIC

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions

12/16/2015: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions

Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion fro Sanctions and Plaintiffs' Request for Fees and Costs for Having to Defend

2/17/2016: Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld in Support of Opposition to Defendant's Motion fro Sanctions and Plaintiffs' Request for Fees and Costs for Having to Defend

Motion re: (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Extending Time to File First Amended Cross-Complaint

7/5/2016: Motion re: (name extension) - Ex Parte Application for Extending Time to File First Amended Cross-Complaint

Other - (name extension) - Consolidated Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Compel Discovery, for Order Establishing Admissions, and for Sanctions

7/25/2016: Other - (name extension) - Consolidated Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Compel Discovery, for Order Establishing Admissions, and for Sanctions

Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld in Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Defendant's Improper SACC, and/or to Consolidate all of Plaintiffs' Demurrer Related Proceedings on

11/29/2016: Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld in Support of Ex Parte Application to Strike Defendant's Improper SACC, and/or to Consolidate all of Plaintiffs' Demurrer Related Proceedings on

Motion re: (name extension) - to Compel Attendance and Testimony of Plaintiffs Jean and Howard Rosenfeld

12/12/2016: Motion re: (name extension) - to Compel Attendance and Testimony of Plaintiffs Jean and Howard Rosenfeld

Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Answers to Special Interrogatories and for Sanctions

12/22/2016: Declaration (name extension) - of Counsel Ben Rosenfeld in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Answers to Special Interrogatories and for Sanctions

Opposition (name extension) - to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's First Amended Cross-Complaint

1/3/2017: Opposition (name extension) - to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant's First Amended Cross-Complaint

Other - (name extension) - Order

1/3/2017: Other - (name extension) - Order

(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL--CIVIL FILED.

6/14/2017: (name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL--CIVIL FILED.

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer with Motion to Strike; Hearing on Motion ...) of 09/12/2017

9/12/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Demurrer with Motion to Strike; Hearing on Motion ...) of 09/12/2017

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Dismissing Cross-Defendants' Eric Rosenfeld, Anne Kao, and Kenneth Kao, Request for Reimbursement and/or sanctions

10/18/2017: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Order Dismissing Cross-Defendants' Eric Rosenfeld, Anne Kao, and Kenneth Kao, Request for Reimbursement and/or sanctions

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - for order dismissing

10/18/2017: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - for order dismissing

Opposition (name extension)

11/30/2017: Opposition (name extension)

Special Verdict

12/8/2017: Special Verdict

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 02/02/2018 and minute order of 02/02/18 11:00 A.M. and judgments

2/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 02/02/2018 and minute order of 02/02/18 11:00 A.M. and judgments

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

3/22/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Proof of Service by Mail

5/3/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

266 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 6 - 10 Volumes Certified; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal BV032721; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript BV032721; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcripts Deposit Paid; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Reporter Appeal Transcript Process Fee Paid; Filed by: SHAHROUZ JAHANSHAHI (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice to Appellant of Estimated Transcript Costs BV032721 NOA 4/23/18; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Submit Estimated Cost BV032721; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order Stay of Judgment: Result: Denied; Result Date: 07/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Stay Execution) of 07/02/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
634 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL BEN ROSENFELD IN SUPPORT OF REPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketMOTION FILED: ....X....1....X....2....X HEARING SET FOR 00/00/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketDEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' (CORRECTED) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketMOTION FILED: ....X....1....X....2....X HEARING SET FOR 00/00/00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketA/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL BEN ROSENFELD IN SUPPORT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 15K09197    Hearing Date: June 25, 2020    Dept: J

ROSENFELD v. JAHANSHAHI

Case Number: 15K09197

Department J

Santa Monica Courthouse

West District

June 22, 2020

Ruling re Plaintiff’s Motion for Attorney’s Fees and Costs

Costs

Plaintiffs’ Memorandum of Costs was filed within the statutory time. CRC rule 8.891(c)(1). The fact that the wrong form was used is an irrelevant clerical error. That error was corrected, again within the required time frame.

The plaintiffs are entitled to costs on appeal. CRC rule 8.891(a)(1).

Plaintiff is awarded the costs on appeal of $72.05, as well as the costs related to this motion of $99.45. These costs are to be paid by the defendant to plaintiffs’ attorney, Ben Rosenfeld.

Attorney’s Fees

Defendant claims that the court’s denial of attorney’s fees at trial applies to the request for such fees after appeal. One has nothing to do with the other. Defendant fails to address the specific issue of plaintiff’s entitlement to attorney’s fees on appeal. The issue was waived.

Assuming there was no waiver, plaintiffs are still entitled to attorney’s fees. CRC rule 3.1702 (c). Defendant mischaracterizes this court’s denial of attorney’s fees posttrial by stating, “[p]laintiffs abused the process…”. See Defendant’s Opposition to Plaintiff’s Motion for Attorney Fees, p. lines 17-18. There was no abuse.

The declaration filed by attorney Rosenfeld conforms to CCP section 2015.5.

The motion to claim the attorney’s fees on appeal was timely. CRC rules 3.1702(c)(1) and 8.891(c)(1).

“The primary method for establishing the amount of “reasonable” attorney fees is the lodestar method…. The lodestar… Is produced by multiplying the number of hours reasonably expended by counsel by a reasonable hourly rate.” Lealao v. Beneficial California, Inc. (2000) 82 Cal.App.4th 19, 26.

The court finds that the hourly rate of $450 is reasonable considering the attorney’s years in practice and skill demonstrated throughout the proceedings. The court further finds that the 57.25 hours requested are also reasonable. The time expended was reasonably necessitated by the need to respond to the appeal and written arguments on this motion.

Plaintiffs are awarded $25,762.50 for attorney’s fees on appeal payable by the defendant to attorney Ben Rosenfeld.