This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2021 at 00:22:20 (UTC).

ROSANNA RAMOS VS ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/26/2019 ROSANNA RAMOS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RAY A. SANTANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0802

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RAY A. SANTANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMOS ROSANNA

Defendants

BARKER MANAGEMENT INCORPORATED

ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS LP

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/23/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/12/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/12/2021

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/12/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

8/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/23/2020

9/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/23/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

9/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/23/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

4/2/2020: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

4/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service), Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/22/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/21/2020: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/21/2020

2/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/21/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2020

1/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/17/2020

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

11/20/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/20/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/12/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rosanna Ramos on 09/26/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/12/2021 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 updated: Result Date to 01/12/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/23/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAddress for Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/12/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff); Alexandria Housing Partners, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 01/17/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners, LP (Defendant); Barker Management, Incorporated (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Alexandria Housing Partners, LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) (Sheriff Department); Filed by: Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Alexandria Housing Partners, LP (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff); As to: Alexandria Housing Partners, LP (Defendant); Barker Management, Incorporated (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Rosanna Ramos (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ray A. Santana in Department 90 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 90

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALEXANDRIA HOUSING PARTNERS L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where BARKER MANAGEMENT INCORPORATED is a litigant