This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:55:54 (UTC).

ROSA VALDEZ VS FINE PARTNERS INC

Case Summary

On 07/23/2018 ROSA VALDEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FINE PARTNERS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3917

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALDEZ ROSA

Defendant

FINE PARTNERS INC DBA 99 CENT DOLLAR BARGAIN INC

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/30/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

12/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

12/20/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

2/7/2019: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/7/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/7/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/7/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/20/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

2/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/20/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/20/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

2/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 02/20/2019

2/20/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 02/20/2019

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

3/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

3/5/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

3/5/2019: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/23/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2019
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: FINE PARTNERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Updated -- Request to Pay Judgment to Court: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 03/05/2019 ; Status Date changed from 02/20/2019 to 03/05/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ROSA VALDEZ against Defendant FINE PARTNERS INC DBA 99 CENT DOLLAR BARGAIN INC on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ROSA VALDEZ on 07/23/2018 for the principal amount of $230.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $305.00.; Other: The Court finds Plaintiff to be 80% responsible for the accident and the store 20% responsible. The Court also finds the medical bills to be inflated and has reduced the award for medical bills to 50% of the billed amount. 20% of the 50% is the resultant Plaintiff's award amount.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 02/20/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • Updated -- 02/07/2019 Non-Jury Trial: Location changed from Department SE2 to Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: ROSA VALDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FINE PARTNERS INC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/22/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/07/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/17/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion; Result Type from Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion to Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROSA VALDEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FINE PARTNERS INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less