This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 00:51:24 (UTC).

ROSA TRUSTY AVILA VS ANA SILVA

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 ROSA TRUSTY AVILA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANA SILVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4940

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUSTY AVILA ROSA

Defendants

SILVA ANA

ML VIRGINIA LLC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

1/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/21/2019: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

3/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/7/2019: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

1/11/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice SMALL CLAIMS REASSIGNMENT

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2019

6/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/4/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2019

3/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/19/2019

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/19/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • On the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (3rd) filed by ROSA TRUSTY AVILA on 12/13/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/11/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/11/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Updated -- ML VIRGINIA LLC (Defendant): First Name: blank; Last Name: blank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: As to: ROSA TRUSTY AVILA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/11/2019 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/19/2019 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROSA TRUSTY AVILA (Plaintiff); As to: ANA SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROSA TRUSTY AVILA (Plaintiff); As to: ANA SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from ANA SILVA (Defendant) to ANA SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Updated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from ANA SILVA (Defendant) to ANA SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROSA TRUSTY AVILA (Plaintiff); As to: ANA SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from ANA SILVA (Defendant) to ANA SILVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.