This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/01/2019 at 00:59:09 (UTC).

ROSA MARIA MACIAS, ET AL. VS WASSIM FAOZI ISSA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 ROSA MARIA MACIAS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WASSIM FAOZI ISSA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0995

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MACIAS ALBERT

MACIAS ROSA MARIA

Defendants

MARTINEZ RUBEN

ISSA WASSIM FAOZI

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) (The court orders: To show proof of medical bills)]

7/5/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) (The court orders: To show proof of medical bills)]

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) (The 2nd Request to Make Payments is denied)]

8/7/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) (The 2nd Request to Make Payments is denied)]

Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - (The 2nd Request to Make Payments is denied)

8/7/2018: Order on Request to Make Payments (Small Claims) - (The 2nd Request to Make Payments is denied)

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

8/8/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Request to Pay Judgment to Court

8/20/2018: Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)

8/20/2018: Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

8/20/2018: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

8/22/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

12/19/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Los Angeles - Wholly Satisfied)

1/23/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return (Los Angeles - Wholly Satisfied)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

6/14/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)]

Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

6/14/2018: Request to Make Payments (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

5/17/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/17/2018

5/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/17/2018

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

5/25/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

4/27/2018: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/11/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/12/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2019
  • Request for Refund / Order; Filed by: Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Updated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Updated -- Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment: As To Parties changed from Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant), Ruben Martinez (Defendant) to Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant), Ruben Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Writ - Return (Los Angeles - Wholly Satisfied) ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 59.47; Interest Credits: 35.00; Principal Credits: 1,801.50; Possession: No; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/23/2019 ; Status Date changed from 01/03/2019 to 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/03/2019 ; Status Date changed from 08/22/2018 to 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 01/03/2019 ; Status Date changed from 01/03/2019 to 01/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Rosa Maria Macias (Plaintiff); As to: Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant); Ruben Martinez (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 08/22/2018 ; Status Date changed from 05/25/2018 to 08/22/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 05/17/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Wassim Faozi Issa on 04/27/2018 as follows: Plaintiffs Rosa Maria Macias; Albert Macias do not owe the defendant Wassim Faozi Issa any money on defendant's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/17/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • Other - Proof of Service by Mail only no Personal Service. Filed by: Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant); As to: Rosa Maria Macias (Plaintiff); Albert Macias (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rosa Maria Macias (Plaintiff); Albert Macias (Plaintiff); As to: Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/28/18; Service Cost: 63.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rosa Maria Macias (Plaintiff); Albert Macias (Plaintiff); As to: Ruben Martinez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/28/18; Service Cost: 32.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rosa Maria Macias (Plaintiff); Albert Macias (Plaintiff); As to: Wassim Faozi Issa (Defendant); Ruben Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.