This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 02:39:51 (UTC).

ROSA MARIA GONZALEZ VS LUZ KALLET

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 ROSA MARIA GONZALEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUZ KALLET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6310

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ROSA MARIA

Defendant

KALLET LUZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEND GERARD

Defendant Attorney

ARAKELYAN IRENA

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/5/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

7/5/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/5/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

3/23/2020: Answer - Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

3/23/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/30/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order [Proposed] Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC [And Related Motion/Discovery dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Central Distric

4/5/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order [Proposed] Order and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC [And Related Motion/Discovery dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Central Distric

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 08/31/2021

8/31/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 08/31/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

8/31/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/27/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/7/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notification of Disqualification to Act as Attorney

5/19/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notification of Disqualification to Act as Attorney

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

9/20/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • Hearing01/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; Signed and Filed by: Luz Kallet (Defendant); As to: Rosa Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Jury Trial scheduled for 09/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/13/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel) of 08/31/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel scheduled for 08/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/31/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketReset - Court Unavailable, Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/22/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 09/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Luz Kallet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosa Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Luz Kallet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosa Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Luz Kallet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rosa Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Luz Kallet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rosa Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); As to: Luz Kallet (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 19STLC06310 Hearing Date: August 31, 2021 Dept: 26

Gonzalez v. Kallet, et\r\nal 19STLC06310

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Gerard L. Friend, Esq. of the Law\r\nOffices of Gerard L. Friend’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff Rosa\r\nMaria Gonzalez is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE\r\nEFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEND GERARD LOUIS