Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 07:13:45 (UTC).

ROSA HARRIS VS JONATHAN BONILLA

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 ROSA HARRIS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONATHAN BONILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2644

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRIS ROSA

Defendant

BONILLA JONATHAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

4/6/2021: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

12/10/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

10/23/2020: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/30/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/9/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

12/10/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

12/10/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

12/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/10/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/23/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ROSA HARRIS against Defendant JONATHAN BONILLA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ROSA HARRIS on 09/23/2020 for the principal amount of $2,350.00 and costs of $140.00 for a total of $2,490.00.; Other: Market vale of car less salvage plus reasonable loss of use.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketOther - Exhibits Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 12/10/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 12/09/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from JONATHAN BONILLA (Defendant) to JONATHAN BONILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: ROSA HARRIS (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN BONILLA (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: ROSA HARRIS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/09/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROSA HARRIS (Plaintiff); As to: JONATHAN BONILLA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less