This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 23:15:34 (UTC).

ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SERVICES VS HARRY LOW

Case Summary

On 09/14/2016 ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SERVICES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARRY LOW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3454

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING SERVICES

8440 White Oak Ave

Northridge, CA 91325

Defendant

LOW HARRY

Van Nuys, CA 91401

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2016: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/14/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/14/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/10/2016: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/10/2016: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

11/10/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 11/10/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/10/2016: Minute Order of 11/10/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2017
  • Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Invoice: Issuing,Writ, Acknowlgment, Abstract, Satisfaction-GC 70626(a)(1-2)(4-8); CCP 116.820; Fee: $25.00; Payment: 25.00 Receipt: VE-2017-0011560 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Rooter Master plumbing Services (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Stipulation and Order Appointing Member of State Bar as Temporary Judge; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 11/10/2016 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/10/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z updated: Result Date to 11/10/2016; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Rooter Master plumbing Services against Defendant Harry Low on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rooter Master plumbing Services on 09/14/2016 for the principal amount of $1,500.00 and costs of $70.00 for a total of $1,570.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rooter Master plumbing Services (Plaintiff); As to: Harry Low (Defendant); Proof Of Mailing: Yes; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rooter Master plumbing Services (Plaintiff); As to: Harry Low (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0004076 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Invoice: Fee Preparing Copy of any Record(per page) - GC70627(a); Fee: $5.00; Payment: 5.00 Receipt: VE-2016-0004076 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence P. Riff at Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department Z

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/10/2016 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department Z

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Rooter Master plumbing Services (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROOTER MASTER PLUMBING is a litigant