This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/01/2018 at 19:07:16 (UTC).

RONALD HARDWAY VS TERENCE CHAPMAN

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 RONALD HARDWAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TERENCE CHAPMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1439

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARDWAY RONALD

Santa Clarita, CA 91390

Defendant

CHAPMAN TERENCE

Santa Clarita, CA 91390

 

Court Documents

(Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

12/27/2017: (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

1/26/2018: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

1/25/2018: (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018

1/25/2018: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018

Unknown

1/10/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/9/2018: Unknown

Unknown

12/18/2017: Unknown

[Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

12/21/2017: [Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Unknown

12/20/2017: Unknown

Unknown

12/15/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

11/15/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

11/15/2017: Unknown

Unknown

10/31/2017: Unknown

[Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

10/31/2017: [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Unknown

9/14/2017: Unknown

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 01/25/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 updated: Result Date to 01/25/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Ronald Hardway on 09/14/2017, Order for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to Terence Chapman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Defendant Terence Chapman against Plaintiff Ronald Hardway on the Defendant's Claim filed by Terence Chapman on 01/09/2018 for the principal amount of $3,400.00 and costs of $75.00 for a total of $3,475.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Terence Chapman (Defendant); As to: Ronald Hardway (Plaintiff); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/09/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Terence Chapman (Defendant); As to: Ronald Hardway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Issued by: Clerk; As to: Ronald Hardway (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/15/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 12/27/2017 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Ronald Hardway (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Ronald Hardway (Plaintiff); As to: Terence Chapman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/14/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 11/15/2017 08:30 AM at 11/15/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less