Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:31:51 (UTC).

ROLANDO G. GUEVARA VS EXTRA CHEESE, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/08/2017 ROLANDO G GUEVARA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against EXTRA CHEESE, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4970

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUEVARA ROLANDO G.

Defendants

EXTRA CHEESE LLC

EXTRA CHEESE LLC DBA PAPA JOHN'S PIZZA

EXTRA CHEESE LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MERLUZA RICARDO YUAGA

Defendant Attorney

RANEN JEFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Answer

2/2/2018: Answer

Request for Dismissal

5/25/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

12/8/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

12/8/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/8/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Rolando G. Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Extra Cheese, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Extra Cheese, LLC, A California Corporation (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Extra Cheese, LLC to Extra Cheese, LLC, A California Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/07/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/11/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rolando G. Guevara (Plaintiff); As to: Extra Cheese, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rolando G. Guevara (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

. ! Y r

s IRicardo Y. Merluza, Esqg. SBN 199495 FILED MERLUZA LAW Superior Court of California

2 13435 Wilshire Blvd. County of Los Angeles Suite 2745

3 |Los Angeles, CA 90010 DEC 0.8 2017

Telephone: (213) 380-9888

4 |Facsimile: (213) 380-5397 Sherri R faner Execytive Officer/Clerk E-mail: ricardo@merluzalaw.com By, ~ iy Deputy 5 Victor Sino-Cruz

Attorneys for Plaintiff, 6 [Rolando G. Guevara

Superior Court of the State of California

For the County of Los Angeles

10 |Rolando G. Guevara, an Case No.: 17STLCO4970

individual [Limited jurisdiction] 11 (Not more than $25,000.00) 12 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: _ 13 Plaintiff, 1) Failure to Provide 14 Tiss Rest Periods y (Cal.Lab.Code §§226.7, 15 512) ; 16 2) Failure to Provide Meal Periods 17 (Cal.Lab.Code §§226.7, 512) ; 18 19 |Extra Cheese, LLC (a California 3) Waiting Time Penalties ,, |corporation); Extra Cheese, LLC (Cal.?ab.Code §§201, et dba Papa John’s Pizza; and Does seq.];

21 (1= 50, inclusive 4) Violation of Unfair

22 - Competition Laws Defendants. (Cal. B & P §17200, et. 23 seq.) ; 24

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

25 26 27 o 28

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXTRA CHEESE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANEN JEFFREY S