This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2021 at 23:01:16 (UTC).

ROJAS, LOURDES VS BOWMAN PLATING COMPANY, INC

Case Summary

On 09/07/2016 ROJAS, LOURDES filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BOWMAN PLATING COMPANY, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. SCHUUR. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2869

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. SCHUUR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROJAS LOURDES

Defendants

ESFANDI MAC

BOWMAN PLATING COMPANY INC

AKHAVI MASSOUD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSIAK RICHARD J.

Defendant Attorney

BORISON CRAIG S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketOrder CASE FILE DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketOrder CASE FILE DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NOR443666011 . S.A.S.E., A.SILVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT SEW FOR CONSIDERATION MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 26.66 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 2025.00 FILED BY (RICHARD J. ROSIAK),ESQ. .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SEW , HON. MICHAEL L. SCHUUR PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING ATTORNEY RICHARD J. ROSIAK . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING ATTORNEY CRAIG BORISON .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/11/16 , FOR (ROJAS, LOURDES) , AGAINST (BOWMAN PLATING COMPANY, INC) , (ESFANDI, MAC) , (AKHAVI, MASSOUD) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 2635 E. 126TH STREET COMPTON, CA 90222 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46. A WRIT OF POSSESSION MAY BE ISSUED FORTHWITH.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (BOWMAN PLATING COMPANY, INC) , (ESFANDI, MAC) , (AKHAVI, MASSOUD) . RECEIPT # NOR509405005 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AKHAVI, MASSOUD) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ESFANDI, MAC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BOWMAN PLATING COMPANY, INC) .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NOR542364003. Filing Fee: 240.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 10/24/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SEF . .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less