This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 20:01:27 (UTC).

ROIC PARAMOUNT PLAZA, LLC VS ALAA YAHIA ELBEIALY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 ROIC PARAMOUNT PLAZA, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALAA YAHIA ELBEIALY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6354

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROIC PARAMOUNT PLAZA LLC

Defendants

ELBEIALY ALAA YAHIA DBA NUEVA VALLARTA

ELBEIALY SAMAR DBA NUEVA VALLARTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STELZER CYNTHIA DENISE

Defendant Attorney

LETTENMAIER ARTHUR JAMES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/19/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - on Complaint

4/19/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/19/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - (Amended)

7/13/2018: Complaint - (Amended)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/31/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/24/2018: Answer

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order for the Court to Retain Jurisdiction

10/18/2019: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order for the Court to Retain Jurisdiction

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment]

9/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment]

Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment

9/16/2019: Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment - Notice of Rejection - Stipulated Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/2/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal Filed Not Entered: Name Extension: Filed Not Entered; As To Parties changed from Alaa Yahia Elbeialy (Defendant), Samar Elbeialy (Defendant) to Samar Elbeialy (Defendant), Alaa Yahia Elbeialy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1928338 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:1928339 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alaa Yahia Elbeialy (Defendant); Samar Elbeialy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC on 07/13/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC on 07/13/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order for the Court to Retain Jurisdiction; Filed by: Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alaa Yahia Elbeialy (Defendant); Samar Elbeialy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/22/2021 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 04/21/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Samar Elbeialy (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/17/2018; Service Cost: 57.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alaa Yahia Elbeialy (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/17/2018; Service Cost: 97.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- First Amended Complaint for Contribution: Status Date changed from 07/13/2018 to 04/19/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Roic Paramount Plaza, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Alaa Yahia Elbeialy (Defendant); Samar Elbeialy (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LETTENMAIER ARTHUR JAMES