Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 18:42:25 (UTC).

ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS OMAR MEZA

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against OMAR MEZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1575

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

MEZA OMAR

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

10/21/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO)

10/23/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (SACRAMENTO)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/23/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

9/23/2019: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest - Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

9/25/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

6/14/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

6/14/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

6/14/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

6/14/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/26/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (SACRAMENTO); Issued by: Clerk; County: SACRAMENTO; Principal: 1,352.29; Interest: 42.98; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: OMAR MEZA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 42.98; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 10/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (LOS ANGELES); Issued by: Clerk; County: LOS ANGELES; Principal: 1,352.29; Interest: 32.97; Costs: 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Roger's Acceptance Corporation to (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketAddress for (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: (ROGERS ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION) (Plaintiff); As to: OMAR MEZA (Defendant); Costs: 0.00; Interest: 32.97; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 06/14/2019 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 06/14/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party / Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Roger's Acceptance Corporation against Defendant OMAR MEZA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Roger's Acceptance Corporation on 03/26/2019 for the principal amount of $1,272.29 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $1,352.29.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from OMAR MEZA (Defendant) to OMAR MEZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: OMAR MEZA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/06/2019; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from OMAR MEZA (Defendant) to OMAR MEZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: Status Date changed from 04/09/2019 to 04/08/2019; As To Parties changed from OMAR MEZA (Defendant) to OMAR MEZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: OMAR MEZA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORP is a litigant