This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2021 at 02:05:07 (UTC).

ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION VS HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6205

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

MAGALLON-RAVELO HORACIO

 

Court Documents

Other - (name extension) - Other - Statement of Decision Re: Continuance

12/2/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Statement of Decision Re: Continuance

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/2/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/02/2021

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/02/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2020

12/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment]

Attachment - Attachment

7/22/2020: Attachment - Attachment

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/11/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

5/12/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

5/12/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020

5/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 05/26/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/26/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/23/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

2/20/2020: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

2/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Roger's Acceptance Corporation on 12/02/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 02/02/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Remote Appearance Information]: Name Extension changed from [Attachment] to [Attachment, Remote Appearance Information]; As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketOther - Statement of Decision Re: Continuance; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/02/2021 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/01/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/23/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Correspondence: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/14/19; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service: As To Parties changed from HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO (Defendant) to HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/03/2020 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Roger's Acceptance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: HORACIO MAGALLON-RAVELO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROGER'S ACCEPTANCE CORP is a litigant