This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 01:01:41 (UTC).

RODRIGUEZ, MARIA J VS SAVE THE QUEEN

Case Summary

On 12/07/2015 RODRIGUEZ, MARIA J filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SAVE THE QUEEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5186

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ MARIA J

Defendants

SAVE THE QUEEN

QUEEN SAVE THE DBA THE QUEEN MARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF ROGER W LOPEZ

Defendant Attorney

HOSP GILBERT & BERGSTEN A LAW CORP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FIELD NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FIELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL FILED. REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/07/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • OSC SET 12/07/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - OTHER PREMISE LIABILITY Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE QUEEN MARY is a litigant