This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2020 at 12:19:45 (UTC).

RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC VS SIAVOSH BANIHSEMI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SIAVOSH BANIHSEMI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3621

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC

Defendants

BANIHSEMI SIAVOSH

CLUB SPORTIVA INC DBA CLUB SPORTIVA

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/12/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

12/12/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/12/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/06/2020

2/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/06/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 02/06/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Rodeo Exotic Rentals LLC on 12/12/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/06/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rodeo Exotic Rentals LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Siavosh Banihsemi (Defendant); Club Sportiva Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DRIVE LLC , 8010 SUNPORT is a litigant

Latest cases where RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant