This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2019 at 08:32:32 (UTC).

RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC VS GAURAVJIT SINGH

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GAURAVJIT SINGH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1958

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC

Defendant

SINGH GAURAVJIT

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

7/2/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/2/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

7/2/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/13/2019 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Rodeo Exotic Rentals LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Gauravjit Singh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RODEO EXOTIC RENTALS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant