Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 02:01:36 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD VS TORRES CONSTRUCTION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX, LTD filed an Other lawsuit against TORRES CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6715

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD

Defendants

TORRES FIDEL

GARCIA ANA CELIA

TORRES CONSTRUCTION

ARANDA FRANCISCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENCARNACION MERVYN YOUNG

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

Summons - on Complaint

5/2/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/2/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/2/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix, LTD (Plaintiff); As to: Torres Construction (Defendant); Fidel Torres (Defendant); Francisco Aranda (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix, LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TORRES CONSTRUCTION CORP. A CALIF. CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENCARNACION MERVYN YOUNG