Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 07:46:46 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD., A PARTNERSHIP VS GHBW, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD , A PARTNERSHIP filed an Other lawsuit against GHBW. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4891

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD. A PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

BWC/LA CIENEGA LP

GHBW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ENCARNACION MERVYN YOUNG

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/16/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/7/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/21/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/21/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/21/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • On the Complaint filed by Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership on 05/21/2019, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: GHBW (Defendant); BWC/La Cienega LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); Service Date: 05/29/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); Service Date: 05/29/2019; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/17/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: GHBW (Defendant); BWC/La Cienega LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: GHBW (Defendant); BWC/La Cienega LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: GHBW (Defendant); BWC/La Cienega LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: GHBW (Defendant); BWC/La Cienega LP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GHBW A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ENCARNACION MERVYN YOUNG