This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2021 at 09:10:59 (UTC).

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD., A PARTNERSHIP VS ANGEL CASTILLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD , A PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ANGEL CASTILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9367

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTSON'S READY MIX LTD. A PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

JOURDAN JACQUI AKA JACKIE JORDAN

CASTILLO ANGEL

BOYD JACQUELINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KIM RICHARD KYUNG

 

Court Documents

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND RELEASE

3/16/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition TO DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND RELEASE

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order) of 03/30/2021

3/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order) of 03/30/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order)

3/30/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/16/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

1/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

1/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) - Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

1/13/2021: Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court) - Notice: Waiver of Court Fees (Superior Court)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

1/6/2021: Answer - Answer

Application and Notice of Application and Hearing for Order to Quash Ex Parte Writ of Possession - Application and Notice of Application and Hearing for Order to Quash Ex Parte Writ of Possession

1/6/2021: Application and Notice of Application and Hearing for Order to Quash Ex Parte Writ of Possession - Application and Notice of Application and Hearing for Order to Quash Ex Parte Writ of Possession

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/6/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

11/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order) of 03/30/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Vacate set aside right to attach order scheduled for 03/30/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/30/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketOpposition TO DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND RELEASE; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Castillo (Defendant); Jacqueline Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Angel Castillo; Jacqueline Boyd; On the Complaint filed by Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership on 11/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jacqui Jourdan (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Jacqui Jourdan (Defendant); As to: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Jacqui Jourdan (Defendant); Service Date: 12/09/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Castillo (Defendant); Service Date: 11/18/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Castillo (Defendant); Jacqui Jourdan (Defendant); Jacqueline Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Castillo (Defendant); Jacqui Jourdan (Defendant); Jacqueline Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robertson's Ready Mix Ltd., a Partnership (Plaintiff); As to: Angel Castillo (Defendant); Jacqui Jourdan (Defendant); Jacqueline Boyd (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC09367    Hearing Date: March 30, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., March 30, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Robertson’s Ready Mix, Ltd. v. Castillo, et al.

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC09367 COMPL. FILED: 11-06-20

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 04-06-22

DISC. MOT. C/O: 04-21-22

TRIAL DATE: 05-06-22

PROCEEDINGS: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, QUASH WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND RELEASE ATTACHED PROPERTY

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Jacqui Jordan aka Jacqueline Boyd, in pro per

RESP. PARTY: Plaintiff Robertson’s Ready Mix, Ltd.

APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER, QUASH WRIT OF ATTACHMENT, AND RELEASE ATTACHED PROPERTY

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Jacqui Jordan aka Jacqueline Boyd’s Application to Set Aside Right to Attach Order, Quash Writ of Attachment, and Release Attached Property is DENIED.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: Filed on March 16, 2021 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 26, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On November 6, 2020, Plaintiff Robertson’s Ready Mix, Ltd. (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, common counts, and foreclosure of mechanic’s lien against Defendants Angel Castillo (“Castillo”) and Jacqui Jordan aka Jacqueline Boyd (“Boyd”) (collectively, “Defendants”). Following his failure to respond to the Complaint, default was entered against Defendant Castillo on February 16, 2021.

Defendant Boyd filed an Answer, in pro per, on January 6, 2021. She also filed the instant form Application to Set Aside Right to Attach Order, Quash Writ of Attachment, and Release Attached Property (the “Application”). Plaintiff filed an Opposition on March 16, 2021.

As an initial matter, the Court notes it has not issued a right to attach order or writ of attachment in this case. Thus, the Application Defendant Boyd filed is inapplicable. To the extent Defendant Boyd seeks to release her property from a mechanic’s lien, she must file a noticed motion to do so pursuant to Civil Code section 8480, et seq.

The instant Application is DENIED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Jacqui Jordan aka Jacqueline Boyd’s Application to Set Aside Right to Attach Order, Quash Writ of Attachment, and Release Attached Property is DENIED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROBERTSON'S READY MIX INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM RICHARD KYUNG