This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 01:43:41 (UTC).

ROBERTO TORRES VS DIANE REED

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 ROBERTO TORRES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DIANE REED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3943

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TORRES ROBERTO

Defendant

REED DIANE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

10/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/30/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/30/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

10/30/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/30/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Other - (name extension) - Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT

11/19/2018: Other - (name extension) - Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

1/2/2019: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

1/31/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

1/31/2019: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

3/6/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

4/2/2019: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/16/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice - Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

9/10/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/18/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/14/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Updated -- Judgment entered on 04/02/2019 ; Status Date changed from 10/30/2018 to 04/02/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: ROBERTO TORRES (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Roseeffective 02/04/2019; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: DIANE REED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Other - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff ROBERTO TORRES against Defendant DIANE REED on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by ROBERTO TORRES on 08/14/2018 for the principal amount of $2,931.13 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $3,046.13.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/30/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/18/2018; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: DIANE REED (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: ROBERTO TORRES (Plaintiff); As to: DIANE REED (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/18/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less