This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 14:19:52 (UTC).

ROBERTO QUEZADA VS MTG, LLC.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 ROBERTO QUEZADA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MTG, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2091

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUEZADA ROBERTO

Defendant

MTG LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

POMERANTZ ANDREW SLONE

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/24/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/24/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

9/24/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

9/24/2018: Complaint

Motion to Quash - Motion to Quash Service

10/25/2018: Motion to Quash - Motion to Quash Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 12/06/2018

12/6/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 12/06/2018

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/29/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

01/30/2019

DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/29/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2019

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/29/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2019

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/29/2019

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Roberto Quezada (Plaintiff); As to: MTG, LLC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2019

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Roberto Quezada on 09/24/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Roberto Quezada as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018

DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 01/31/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018

DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons) of 12/06/2018; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2018

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/31/2019 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/05/2018

DocketHearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons scheduled for 12/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2018

DocketMotion to Quash Service; Filed by: MTG, LLC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Roberto Quezada (Plaintiff); As to: MTG, LLC. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Roberto Quezada (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Roberto Quezada (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Roberto Quezada (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2018

DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

[+] Read More [-] Read Less