This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/03/2020 at 16:49:43 (UTC).

ROBERTO AGUIERRE VS BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 ROBERTO AGUIERRE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5542

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUIERRE ROBERTO

Defendants

BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES INC

1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KESTNER DAVID

Defendant Attorney

ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/2/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/2/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/2/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint - Complaint

7/2/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/24/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

7/24/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/24/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading) - Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

8/24/2020: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

8/24/2020: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

10/15/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

10/8/2020: Motion to Dismiss - Motion to Dismiss

Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) - Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ROBERTO AGUIERRE'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC MOTION TO ENTER DISMISSAL

10/8/2020: Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) - Notice of Joinder (Name Extension) NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ROBERTO AGUIERRE'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC MOTION TO ENTER DISMISSAL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Enter Dismissal scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by ROBERTO AGUIERRE on 07/02/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by ROBERTO AGUIERRE as to 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC and BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketAddress for david kestner (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Enter Dismissal scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Filed by: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Joinder (Name Extension) NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF ROBERTO AGUIERRE'S JOINDER IN DEFENDANT 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC MOTION TO ENTER DISMISSAL; Filed by: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant); As to: ROBERTO AGUIERRE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 01/25/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROBERTO AGUIERRE (Plaintiff); As to: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: ROBERTO AGUIERRE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROBERTO AGUIERRE (Plaintiff); As to: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROBERTO AGUIERRE (Plaintiff); As to: BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISES, INC (Defendant); 1217 N. MCCADDEN PLACE, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: ROBERTO AGUIERRE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABU-KHAN ENTERPRISE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMSON MICHAEL A.