This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 23:29:08 (UTC).

ROBERT NIXON, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 ROBERT NIXON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5555

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HARRIS TUNISHA

NIXON ROBERT

ISLAND FREDRICK

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OH HYUN

Defendant Attorney

FREEDMAN SCOTT ALAN

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - of payment of advance jury fee deposit

5/15/2018: Notice (name extension) - of payment of advance jury fee deposit

Answer

5/15/2018: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

4/11/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

4/11/2018: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/11/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of payment of advance jury fee deposit; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Robert Nixon (Plaintiff); Tunisha Harris (Plaintiff); Fredrick Island (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant); Service Date: 04/13/18; Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Nixon (Plaintiff); Tunisha Harris (Plaintiff); Fredrick Island (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Gas Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Nixon (Plaintiff); Tunisha Harris (Plaintiff); Fredrick Island (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC05555    Hearing Date: October 05, 2020    Dept: 26

Nixon, et al. v. Southern California Gas Co., et al.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

(CCP § 284(2); CRC Rule 3.1362)

TENTATIVE RULING

John H. Oh, Esq.’s Motions to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs Robert Nixon, Tunisha Harris and Frederick Island are GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE EFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDER UPON ALL PARTIES.

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA GAS COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREEDMAN SCOTT ALAN