This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2020 at 04:04:06 (UTC).

ROBERT LOPEZ VS RALPHS SUPERMARKET

Case Summary

On 05/01/2019 ROBERT LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RALPHS SUPERMARKET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4297

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ ROBERT

Defendant

RALPHS SUPERMARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re Status of Case / Plaintiff's Legal...)

9/9/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re Status of Case / Plaintiff's Legal...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non- Oposition

7/27/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non- Oposition

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 08/04/2020

8/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 08/04/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

8/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/23/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/23/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer - Answer

8/5/2019: Answer - Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/1/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

5/1/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/1/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/1/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

5/1/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Hearing12/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: re Status of Case / Plaintiff's Legal Representation scheduled for 12/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: re Status of Case / Plaintiff's Legal...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: re Status of Case / Plaintiff's Legal Representation scheduled for 09/09/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/14/2020 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: re Status of Case / Plaintiff's Legal Representation scheduled for 09/09/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 08/04/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ralphs Grocery Company dba Ralphs Erroneously Sued As Ralphs Supermarket (Defendant); As to: Robert Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Robert Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Supermarket (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/25/2019; Service Cost: 100.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Robert Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Supermarket (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Supermarket (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Robert Lopez (Plaintiff); As to: Ralphs Supermarket (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04297    Hearing Date: August 04, 2020    Dept: 26

Lopez v. Ralphs Supermarket, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company dba Ralphs’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff To Respond to Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (3) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF CASE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. PLAINTIFF AND/OR PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Robert Lopez (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for premises liability against Defendant Ralphs Grocery Company dba Ralphs (erroneously sued as Ralphs Supermarket) (“Defendant”) on May 1, 2019. On October 23, 2019, Defendant filed the instant (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff To Respond to Form Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (3) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions. To date, no oppositions have been filed.

At the initial hearing on November 21, 2019, the Court noted that an additional filing fee had to be paid and defense counsel represented that Plaintiff’s counsel had passed away. (Minute Order, 11/21/19.) The Court continued the hearing to March 18, 2020 and ordered Defendant to give notice.

To date, no notice of hearing or proof of service has been filed demonstrating that Plaintiff was given notice of the continued hearing date. The Court notes that Defendant did pay the additional filing fee on November 20, 2019. The hearing on the Motions was continued to March 18, 2020, and now ultimately continued to August 4, 2020.

Due to Defendant’s failure to give notice as ordered and defense counsel’s representation regarding the death of Plaintiff’s counsel, the Court places the hearing on the discovery Motions OFF CALENDAR.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE STATUS OF CASE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 9, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. PLAINTIFF AND/OR PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR.

Court clerk to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC04297    Hearing Date: November 20, 2019    Dept: 94

Lopez v. Ralphs Grocery Company et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND DEMAND FOR INSPECTION

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Before the merits of the Motions are considered, the Court notes that Defendant filed two Motions concerning three different discovery methods. It is improper to combine motions seeking different reliefs. Defendant should have filed one discovery motion for each discovery method. As relevant here, Defendant should have filed three separate motions for the three discovery methods at issue: a separate motion to compel form interrogatories, special interrogatories, and demand for inspection. Because Defendant improperly combined three motions into two motions, it only paid two filing fees instead of three. “[P]ayment of filing fees is both mandatory and jurisdictional.” (Hu v. Silgan Containers Corp. (1999) 70 Cal.App.4th 1261, 1269.) “Unless otherwise provided by law, any document for which a filing fee is required under Government Code sections 68926 or 68927 must be accompanied at the time of filing by the required fee or an application for a waiver of court fees under rule 8.26.” (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.25(c).) Accordingly, the Court cannot consider the instant Motions until one additional filing fee is paid.

The moving party is ordered to pay one additional filing fee, and proof of payment must be submitted to the Court Judicial Assistant in Department 94 no later than 10:00 am on the hearing date of November 20, 2019. If the additional filing fee is paid at or before 10:00 am on the hearing date of November 20, 2019, the Court will address the merits of the motions. Otherwise, one of the motion’s requests in the combined motion to compel responses to form interrogatories and special interrogatories will be taken off calendar.