This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 00:41:15 (UTC).

ROBERT LANSING, ET AL. VS CSL 13 ALYSON POURAT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 ROBERT LANSING filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against CSL 13 ALYSON POURAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0854

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioners

COMPLETE POOL AND SPA INC

LANSING ROBERT

Respondents

SOLIVA TODD

CSL 13 ALYSON POURAT

 

Court Documents

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/17/2020: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Vacate)

9/17/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Vacate)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Vacate)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition to Vacate)

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition To Petition To Vacate Arbtiration Award Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure 1285; Declaration Of Alyson Pourat In Support Thereof

6/10/2020: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition To Petition To Vacate Arbtiration Award Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure 1285; Declaration Of Alyson Pourat In Support Thereof

Petition (name extension) - Petition to Vacate

2/28/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition to Vacate

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

2/28/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/28/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Vacate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Vacate scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 09/17/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: CSL 13 Alyson Pourat (Respondent); As to: Complete Pool and Spa, Inc (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition to Vacate)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Petition to Vacate scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/17/2020 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Vacate scheduled for 09/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketOpposition To Petition To Vacate Arbtiration Award Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure 1285; Declaration Of Alyson Pourat In Support Thereof; Filed by: CSL 13 Alyson Pourat (Respondent); Todd Soliva (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketPetition to Vacate; Filed by: Robert Lansing (Petitioner); Complete Pool and Spa, Inc (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Robert Lansing (Petitioner); Complete Pool and Spa, Inc (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Vacate scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP00854    Hearing Date: September 17, 2020    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Thu., September 17, 2020 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Lansing, et al. v. Pourat, et al. PET. FILED: 02-28-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STCP00854

NOTICE: NO

PROCEEDINGS: PETITION TO VACATE CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD

MOVING PARTY: Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.

RESP. PARTY: Respondents Alyson Pourat and Todd Silva, and Real Party in Interest, Magnolia Place Homeowners Association

PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1286.4)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.’s Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: Filed on June 10, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: None filed as of September 15, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background & Discussion

On December 24, 2019, Arbitrator Thomas Craigo (the “Arbitrator”), through the Contractors State License Board Arbitration Program, issued an award requiring Petitioner Complete Pool and Spa, Inc. (“Complete Pool”) to pay Magnolia Place Homeowners Association (“Magnolia”) a total of $9,275.00 (the “Arbitration Award”). (Pet., Attach. 8(c).)

On February 28, 2020, Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool (“collectively, “Petitioners”) filed the instant Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”), in pro per, against Respondents Alyson Pourat and Todd Silva (collectively, “Respondents”). On June 10, 2020, Respondents and Magnolia filed an Opposition.

A hearing on the Petition took place on July 6, 2020. At that time, the Court found that Petitioners did not file a proof of service demonstrating the Petition was properly served and that Petitioners failed to name the entity in whose favor the Arbitration Award was rendered. (7/6/20 Minute Order.) The Court also noted that Petitioner Complete Pool, as a corporation, could not appear in this action in pro per. (Id.) Lastly, the Court noted that Petitioners did not submit any evidence demonstrating the Arbitration Award was improperly rendered. (Id.) For these reasons, the Court continued the hearing, ordered Petitioners to file and serve supplemental papers addressing the noted deficiencies, and warned that failure to do so could result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied. (Id.)

To date, Petitioners have not filed any supplemental papers. Accordingly, the Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.’s Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STCP00854    Hearing Date: July 06, 2020    Dept: 25

PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1286.4)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.’s Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Petitioner Complete Pool must also be represented by an attorney at the next scheduled hearing. Failure to do obey the Court’s orders may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE

[   ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[   ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[   ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: Filed on June 10, 2020 [   ] Late [   ] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 1, 2020   [   ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On December 24, 2019, Arbitrator Thomas Craigo (the “Arbitrator”), through the Contractors State License Board Arbitration Program, issued an award requiring Petitioner Complete Pool and Spa, Inc. (“Complete Pool”) to pay Magnolia Place Homeowners Association (“Magnolia”) a total of $9,275.00 (the “Arbitration Award”). (Pet., Attach. 8(c).)

On February 28, 2020, Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool (“collectively, “Petitioners”) filed the instant Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”), in pro per, against Respondents Alyson Pourat and Todd Silva (collectively, “Respondents”) On June 10, 2020, Respondents and Magnolia filed an Opposition. To date, no reply brief has been filed.  

  1. Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 1286.2 provides, in pertinent part:

“(a) Subject to Section 1286.4, the court shall vacate the award if the court determines any of the following:

(1) The award was procured by corruption, fraud or other undue means.

(2) There was corruption in any of the arbitrators.

(3) The rights of the party were substantially prejudiced by misconduct of a neutral arbitrator.

(4) The arbitrators exceeded their powers and the award cannot be corrected without affecting the merits of the decision upon the controversy submitted.

(6) An arbitrator making the award either: (A) failed to disclose within the time required for disclosure a ground for disqualification...; or (B) was subject to disqualification upon grounds specified in Section 1281.91 but failed upon receipt of timely demand to disqualify himself or herself as required by that provision. . . .”

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1286.4, subd. (a).)

In addition, a petition to vacate an arbitration award must be served and filed no later than 100 days after the date of the service of a signed copy of the award on the petitioner. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1288.)

  1. Discussion

A. Service and Timeliness of the Petition

Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 states, in pertinent part:

“(a) A copy of the petition and a written notice of the time and place of the hearing thereof and any other papers upon which the petition is based shall be served in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice.

(b) If the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made and the person upon whom service is to be made has not previously appeared in the proceeding and has not previously been served in accordance with this subdivision: ¶ (1) Service within this State shall be made in the manner provided by law for the service of summons in an action.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.4, subds. (a), (b).)

“Proper service of process of a petition or complaint is the means by which a court obtains personal jurisdiction over a party. [Citations.]” (Abers v. Rohrs (2013) 217 Cal.App.4th 1199, 1206, emphasis added.) In addition, a petition to vacate an arbitration award must be served and filed no later than 100 days after the date of the service of a signed copy of the award on the petitioner. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1288.)

Here, although Respondents filed an Opposition, Petitioners did not file a proof of service that demonstrates the Petition was served in accordance with Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4. In addition, Petitioners failed to name the correct parties. Specifically, the Arbitration Award was rendered in favor of Magnolia, not Respondents.

B. Corporations Must be Represented by Counsel

Petitioners Lansing, an individual, and Complete Pool, a corporation, filed this Petition, in pro per. However, acorporation may not appear in court except through licensed counsel. Since the passage of the State Bar Act in 1927, persons may represent their own interests in legal proceedings, but may not represent the interests of another unless they are active members of the State Bar. [Citation.]” (Hansen v. Hansen (2003) 114 Cal.App.4th 618, 621.) An entity must be represented by a lawyer in legal proceedings and may not represent itself (either directly or through a non-lawyer agent) in litigation, as such an act would be the unauthorized practice of law. (See e.g. Caressa Camille, Inc. v. Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Bd. (2002) 99 Cal.App.4th 1094, 1101) (corporation); Albion River Watershed Protection Ass’n v. Department of Forestry & Fire Protection (1993) 20 Cal. App. 4th 34, 37 (unincorporated association); Aulisio v. Bancroft (2014) 230 Cal. App. 4th 1518, 1519-20 (trustee for trust).)

Thus, if Petitioner Complete Pool wishes to continue with this action, it must do so through an attorney.

C. Supporting Evidence

However, Petitioners did not submit any evidence that demonstrates the Arbitration Award was the result or fraud or corruption, or evidence that demonstrates the amount of damages awarded were excessive. Although Petitioners attach a short statement, it cannot be considered as evidence as it is wholly unclear who wrote it, and it is not dated and signed under penalty of perjury. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 2015.5.)   

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.’s Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Petitioner Complete Pool must also be represented by an attorney at the next scheduled hearing. Failure to do obey the Court’s orders may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: 20STCP00854    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 25

PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1286.4)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.’s Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Petitioner Complete Pool must also be represented by an attorney at the next scheduled hearing. Failure to do obey the Court’s orders may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

SERVICE:

[ ] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) NO

[ ] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) NO

[ ] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) NO

OPPOSITION: Filed on June 10, 2020 [ ] Late [ ] None

REPLY: None filed as of July 1, 2020 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On December 24, 2019, Arbitrator Thomas Craigo (the “Arbitrator”), through the Contractors State License Board Arbitration Program, issued an award requiring Petitioner Complete Pool and Spa, Inc. (“Complete Pool”) to pay Magnolia Place Homeowners Association (“Magnolia”) a total of $9,275.00 (the “Arbitration Award”). (Pet., Attach. 8(c).)

On February 28, 2020, Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool (“collectively, “Petitioners”) filed the instant Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award (the “Petition”), in pro per, against Respondents Alyson Pourat and Todd Silva (collectively, “Respondents”) On June 10, 2020, Respondents and Magnolia filed an Opposition. To date, no reply brief has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard

Code of Civil Procedure section 1286.2 provides, in pertinent part:

“(a) Subject to Section 1286.4, the court shall vacate the award if the court determines any of the following:

(1) The award was procured by corruption, fraud or other undue means.

(2) There was corruption in any of the arbitrators.

(3) The rights of the party were substantially prejudiced by misconduct of a neutral arbitrator.

(4) The arbitrators exceeded their powers and the award cannot be corrected without affecting the merits of the decision upon the controversy submitted.

(6) An arbitrator making the award either: (A) failed to disclose within the time required for disclosure a ground for disqualification...; or (B) was subject to disqualification upon grounds specified in Section 1281.91 but failed upon receipt of timely demand to disqualify himself or herself as required by that provision. . . .”

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1286.4, subd. (a).)

In addition, a petition to vacate an arbitration award must be served and filed no later than 100 days after the date of the service of a signed copy of the award on the petitioner. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1288.)

  1. Discussion

A. Service and Timeliness of the Petition

Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 states, in pertinent part:

“(a) A copy of the petition and a written notice of the time and place of the hearing thereof and any other papers upon which the petition is based shall be served in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice.

(b) If the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made and the person upon whom service is to be made has not previously appeared in the proceeding and has not previously been served in accordance with this subdivision: ¶ (1) Service within this State shall be made in the manner provided by law for the service of summons in an action.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.4, subds. (a), (b).)

“Proper service of process of a petition or complaint is the means by which a court obtains personal jurisdiction over a party. [Citations.]” (Abers v. Rohrs (2013) 217 Cal.App.4th 1199, 1206, emphasis added.) In addition, a petition to vacate an arbitration award must be served and filed no later than 100 days after the date of the service of a signed copy of the award on the petitioner. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1288.)

Here, although Respondents filed an Opposition, Petitioners did not file a proof of service that demonstrates the Petition was served in accordance with Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4. In addition, Petitioners failed to name the correct parties. Specifically, the Arbitration Award was rendered in favor of Magnolia, not Respondents.

B. Corporations Must be Represented by Counsel

Petitioners Lansing, an individual, and Complete Pool, a corporation, filed this Petition, in pro per. However, a corporation may not appear in court except through licensed counsel. Since the passage of the State Bar Act in 1927, persons may represent their own interests in legal proceedings, but may not represent the interests of another unless they are active members of the State Bar. [Citation.]” (Hansen v. Hansen (2003) 114 Cal.App.4th 618, 621.) An entity must be represented by a lawyer in legal proceedings and may not represent itself (either directly or through a non-lawyer agent) in litigation, as such an act would be the unauthorized practice of law. (See e.g. Caressa Camille, Inc. v. Alcoholic Beverage Control Appeals Bd. (2002) 99 Cal.App.4th 1094, 1101) (corporation); Albion River Watershed Protection Ass’n v. Department of Forestry & Fire Protection (1993) 20 Cal. App. 4th 34, 37 (unincorporated association); Aulisio v. Bancroft (2014) 230 Cal. App. 4th 1518, 1519-20 (trustee for trust).)

Thus, if Petitioner Complete Pool wishes to continue with this action, it must do so through an attorney.

C. Supporting Evidence

Petitioners argue that the Arbitration Award should be vacated (1) because it was obtained by corruption, fraud, or other unfair means and (2) because the arbitrator exceeded his authority and the award cannot be fairly corrected. (Pet., ¶ 10(c).) Specifically, Petitioners argue that Respondents obtained an award for items not covered under the contract and not listed Respondents’ original complaint, and that Respondents were awarded excessive damages despite a lack of evidence demonstrating such damages. (Pet., p. 7.)

However, Petitioners did not submit any evidence that demonstrates the Arbitration Award was the result or fraud or corruption, or evidence that demonstrates the amount of damages awarded were excessive. Although Petitioners attach a short statement, it cannot be considered as evidence as it is wholly unclear who wrote it, and it is not dated and signed under penalty of perjury. (See Code Civ. Proc., § 2015.5.)

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Petitioners Robert Lansing and Complete Pool and Spa, Inc.’s Petition to Vacate Contractual Arbitration Award is CONTINUED TO SEPTEMBER 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. At least 16 court days before the next scheduled hearing, Petitioner must file and serve supplemental papers correcting the deficiencies identified herein. Petitioner Complete Pool must also be represented by an attorney at the next scheduled hearing. Failure to do obey the Court’s orders may result in the Petition being placed off calendar or denied.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.