Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:31:44 (UTC).

ROBERT JAMES NEWMAN, ET AL. VS DANIEL CERVANTES MEZA

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 a Small Claim - Other Small Claim case was filed by ROBERT JAMES NEWMAN against DANIEL CERVANTES MEZA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6117

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

RICHARD F. WALMARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEWMAN ROBERT JAMES

NEWMAN CECILIA YADID

Defendant

CERVANTES MEZA DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

11/26/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

12/10/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/29/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/26/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Robert James Newman (Plaintiff); Cecilia Yadid Newman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Robert James Newman, et al. on 11/26/2018, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Cecilia Yadid Newman and Robert James Newman as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Robert James Newman (Plaintiff); Cecilia Yadid Newman (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Cervantes Meza (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/06/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Richard F. Walmark in Department P Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Robert James Newman (Plaintiff); Cecilia Yadid Newman (Plaintiff); As to: Daniel Cervantes Meza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less