This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 02:21:33 (UTC).

ROBERT DOLL VS PATRICIA LEIVA

Case Summary

On 11/06/2020 ROBERT DOLL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PATRICIA LEIVA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9403

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLL ROBERT

Defendant

LEIVA PATRICIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

O'SULLIVAN MICHAEL PATRICK ESQ.

Other Attorneys

GREEN WILLIAM WARREN

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as Counsel for Pl...)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as Counsel for Pl...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff

8/3/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

8/5/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/2/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

7/2/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/25/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

1/25/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil - Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

1/25/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/6/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

11/6/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/6/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: Filed By: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil for Plaintiff; Filed by: Michael Patrick O'Sullivan, Esq. (Attorney); As to: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as Counsel for Pl...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel as Counsel for Plaintiff, Filed by Michael P. O'Sullivan / La Offices of William W. Green & Associates scheduled for 08/03/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/03/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff: Name Extension: for Plaintiff; As To Parties changed from ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff) to ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Michael Patrick O'Sullivan, Esq. (Attorney): First Name changed from William to Michael; Last Name changed from Green to O'Sullivan; Organization Name changed from Law Offices of William W Green & Associates to Law Offices of William W. Green; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name changed from Warren to Patrick

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAddress for Michael Patrick O'Sullivan, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff); As to: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA LEIVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA LEIVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA LEIVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ROBERT DOLL (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA LEIVA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC09403 Hearing Date: August 3, 2021 Dept: 26

Doll v. Levia, et al. 20STLC09403

MOTION TO BE\r\nRELIEVED AS COUNSEL

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 284(2); CRC\r\nRule 3.1362)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Michael P. O’Sullivan, Esq. of the\r\nLaw Offices of William W. Green’s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff\r\nRobert Doll is GRANTED. PROPOSED ORDERS HAVE BEEN SUBMITTED. RULING TO BE\r\nEFFECTIVE UPON FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED AND CORRECTED ORDER UPON\r\nALL PARTIES.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Moving party to give notice to client and all parties.

\r\n\r\n

'b"

Case Number: 20STLC09403 Hearing Date: July 6, 2021 Dept: 26

Due to Court's unavailability, Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel previously set for hearing on 07/06/2021, has been reset for hearing on 08/03/2021 at 10:00 a.m. "

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN WILLIAM WARREN