This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/31/2019 07:30:32

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by ROB FRANK against LUIS OMAR MARTINEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Catalina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number *******0250
  • Filing Date 01/07/2019
  • Case Status Disposed - Judgment Entered
  • Case Type Property - Residential Eviction
  • Jurisdiction Los Angeles County Superior Courts
  • Judge DOUGLAS W. STERN
  • Courthouse Catalina Courthouse
  • County Los Angeles
  • State California

Party Details

  • Defendant MARTINEZ LUIS OMAR
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff FRANK ROB
  • Represented By
    • JAMES DIANA

Court Documents

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angeles)

3/15/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution (Los Angele...

Fees Apply
Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/7/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Fees Apply
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry ...

2/28/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request...

Fees Apply
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry ...

3/1/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request ...

Fees Apply
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry ...

2/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request...

Fees Apply
Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner...

1/7/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Prop...

Fees Apply
Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Serv...

Fees Apply
Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/25/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Ser...

Fees Apply
Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

2/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Ser...

Fees Apply
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of C...

1/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - N...

Fees Apply
Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Un...

3/4/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Jud...

Fees Apply
Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2019
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/15/2019
  • Writ of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles
  • 03/12/2019
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff)
  • 03/04/2019
  • Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant)
  • 03/04/2019
  • Default judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Rob Frank against Defendant Luis Omar Martinez on the Complaint filed by Rob Frank on 01/07/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 246 Whitley, Avalon, CA 90704 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.
  • 03/04/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Catalina Courthouse at Department 001 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/04/2019
  • 03/01/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant)
  • 03/01/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant); Service Date: 02/17/2019; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 03/01/2019
  • Default entered as to Luis Omar Martinez; On the Complaint filed by Rob Frank on 01/07/2019
  • 02/28/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant)
  • 02/28/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant); Service Date: 02/17/2019; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 02/28/2019
  • ; On the Complaint filed by Rob Frank on 01/07/2019
  • 02/25/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant)
  • 02/25/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rob Frank (Plaintiff); As to: Luis Omar Martinez (Defendant); Service Date: 02/17/2019; Service Cost Waived: Yes
  • 02/25/2019
  • ; On the Complaint filed by Rob Frank on 01/07/2019
  • 02/04/2019
  • Updated -- 03/18/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department 1
  • 02/04/2019
  • Updated -- 03/18/2019 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Department 1 to Department 001
  • 02/01/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department S13 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse
  • 02/01/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office
  • 02/01/2019
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 02/04/2019

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.