This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2020 at 13:33:00 (UTC).

ROB BOWMAN VS JOSEPH T. MARINO

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 ROB BOWMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH T MARINO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1840

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BOWMAN ROB

Defendant

MARINO JOSEPH T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM CURTIS ALLAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/30/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/30/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2023
  • Hearing01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Hearing06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rob Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph T. Marino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rob Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph T. Marino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rob Bowman (Plaintiff); As to: Joseph T. Marino (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC11840    Hearing Date: May 25, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Tue., May 25, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Chilton/25

CASE NAME: Bowman v. Marino COMPL. FILED: 12-30-19

CASE NUMBER: 19STLC11840 DISC. C/O: 05-29-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 06-13-21

TRIAL DATE: 06-28-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO RECLASSIFY

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Rob Bowman

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO RECLASSIFY

(CCP § 403.040)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Rob Bowman’s Motion to Reclassify is GRANTED. The action is transferred to the reclassification desk for reassignment.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of May 20, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of May 20, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On December 30, 2019, Plaintiff Rob Bowman (“Plaintiff”) filed a Complaint alleging breach of contract and common count causes of action against Defendant Joseph T. Marino (“Defendant”). Plaintiff filed a First Amended Complaint (the “FAC”) alleging breach of contract, fraud and deceit, negligent misrepresentation, conversion, common counts, and for foreclosure of lien against Defendant on March 30, 2021.

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Reclassify this Action as an Unlimited Civil Case (the “Motion”) on April 30, 2021. No opposition was filed.

On May 10, Plaintiff filed an Application for Publication of the Summons and FAC, which was granted on May 14, 2021.

II. Legal Standard & Discussion

Here, Defendant has not yet appeared in this action. Plaintiff’s counsel explains that on March 30, Plaintiff filed a FAC which included additional causes of action for relief seeking to recover damages not less than $78,336.00. (Mot., Graham Decl., ¶ 2.) Plaintiff’s counsel states he paid the reclassification fee and that the clerk’s office listed this action as a “general jurisdiction” matter on the Court’s online docket. (Id. at ¶¶ 3-4, Exhs. B, C.)

When a plaintiff files an amended complaint or other amended initial pleading that changes the jurisdictional classification from limited to unlimited, the party at the time of filing the pleading shall pay the reclassification fee and the clerk shall promptly reclassify the case. (Code Civ. Proc., § 403.020, subd. (a).)

This action should have been reclassified upon Plaintiff paying the reclassification fee. Thus, the Motion is GRANTED.

III. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Rob Bowman’s Motion to Reclassify is GRANTED. The action is transferred to the reclassification desk for reassignment.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM CURTIS ALLAN